U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01146
  • Case Name: Doe v. United States
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • May 02, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 01, 2025: [Objection]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 18, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 14, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2025: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.