U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00766
  • Case Name: MARN, Inc. v. Aurora Machine, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Compel]
  • April 03, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Proposed Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Memorandum of Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.