U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00379
  • Case Name: Hazel v. Hartford Hospital
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 17, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 17, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.