U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-01957
  • Case Name: NGM Insurance Company v. Gree USA Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 07, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.