U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-01072
  • Case Name: Johnson v. Gagne et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • May 05, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • May 04, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 02, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed - Prisoner]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • April 18, 2025: [Request for Waiver of Service - Prisoner]
  • April 16, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 14, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 03, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • April 03, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.