U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00395
  • Case Name: Bugbee v. Sarcia
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Consolidate Cases]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 05, 2025: [Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 17, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 17, 2025: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • April 16, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 20, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 18, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.