U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00409
  • Case Name: Merolli v. Community Health Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • May 01, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 29, 2025: [Jury Demand]
  • April 24, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 24, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 19, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.