U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00424
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 17, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 16, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 16, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 15, 2025: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 14, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 03, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 20, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.