U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00459
  • Case Name: Rampal v. Amgen, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judicial Evaluation Program Survey]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
  • March 28, 2025: [Withdraw]
  • March 27, 2025: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • March 25, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order of Transfer]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.