U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00458
  • Case Name: O'Brien v. U.S. Bancorp et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • April 10, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 02, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice Regarding Service]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 20, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.