U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00120
  • Case Name: Finch v. AAA Northeast, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Response]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 29, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.