U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00460
  • Case Name: Cofiell v. Hanwha Aerospace USA LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 26, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.