U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00462
  • Case Name: Edwards v. Covidien Limited Partnership
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 10, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Notice]
  • March 26, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • March 25, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice re: Initial Discovery Protocols]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.