U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00474
  • Case Name: Krishnamurti v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • March 25, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 25, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.