U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00480
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Chentlen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 01, 2025: [Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Response]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice 83.1]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 27, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 27, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 27, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.