U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20277
  • Case Name: Pablo Orlando Nieves
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Debtors Financial Management Course Completion Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.