U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Subh-Marcano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order for PSI and Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [Petition to Enter Guilty Plea]
  • April 21, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 21, 2025: [Consent Form]
  • April 03, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 27, 2025: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.