U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30267
  • Case Name: Mary Jane Gagliardi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Dismiss Case]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.