U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00502
  • Case Name: Hammond v. Equifax Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2025: [Prejudgment Remedy]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Injunction]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Response]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Extension of Time]
  • April 22, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 10, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: [Update Answer Deadline]
  • April 07, 2025: [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 02, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • March 28, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • March 28, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • March 28, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • March 28, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • March 28, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appearance Self Represented Party]
  • March 28, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.