U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20306
  • Case Name: Andy Tiwari
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.