U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-05055
  • Case Name: Partch v. Mensah et al
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Virtual Order Served]
  • May 01, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Order on Motion to Appear Remotely]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Appear Remotely]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Virtual Order Served]
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 17, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Deficiency Notice - Notice of Appearance]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 14, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 02, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Service Executed]
  • April 01, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Document]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 5 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.