U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30294
  • Case Name: Aaron Monaco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (in advance)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Hearing Continued/Rescheduled]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Response - Miscellaneous]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Exhibit(s)/List of Witnesses]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Objection]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Notice of Hearing - Appendix M/N or AP]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Dismiss Case]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.