U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20326
  • Case Name: Jacqueline Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice Re: Trustees Final Report and Final Account]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Closed]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Corrected Amendment]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Deficiency Notice - Amendment]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.