U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-31090
  • Case Name: Lynn Marie Mrowka
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Withdrawal]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Worksheet]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement Regarding Chapter 13 Plan Ready for Confirmation]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order Setting Bankruptcy Case Deadlines for Added Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Claim Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.