U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-50347
  • Case Name: Suzanne McCue
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Statement Regarding Chapter 13 Plan Ready for Confirmation]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Worksheet]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.