U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30318
  • Case Name: Gina Agnello and Roy Agnello
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Order on Motion to Redact]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Redact]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Debtors Financial Management Course Completion Certificate]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Relief from Stay]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.