U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-21263
  • Case Name: Bryan T. Young
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Transfer of Claim]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [none]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Transfer of Claim]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.