U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00567
  • Case Name: Jacobs v. Payward, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 21, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 20, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 20, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Electronic Summons Reissued]
  • April 18, 2025: [Declaratory Judgment]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 14, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • April 11, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • April 11, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 11, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.