U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50306
  • Case Name: Suzanne Laura Novaco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Supplemental Document]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Roumeliotis, George I. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor ]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.