U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30336
  • Case Name: Ipakoi Paridis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Declaration About Individual Debtor's Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Schedules AB-J]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Order on Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.