U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00603
  • Case Name: Moreno v. Roraback et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 30, 2025: [Appearance Self Represented Party]
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent to Electronic Notice]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request to Issue Summons]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [To Participate in Electronic Filing]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • April 17, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2025: [NEW Case Assignment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice re: Disclosure Statement]
  • April 15, 2025: [Filing Fee Received]
  • April 15, 2025: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.