U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30338
  • Case Name: Michael James Seward
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing - Appendix M/N or AP]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice - Amendment]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing - Appendix M/N or AP]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Scheduling Order/Pretrial Order]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Digital Audio Recording]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Held]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Hearing Set]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Expedite Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Turnover]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Extend Time for Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.