U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50308
  • Case Name: Maria Perez Boggia
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.