U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. White
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Re: Due Process (Brady Order)]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arrest ]
  • April 24, 2025: [USM Return Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 24, 2025: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Pretrial Detention]
  • April 23, 2025: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Pretrial Detention]
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Calendar Entry]
  • April 16, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unredacted Foreperson's Signature]
  • April 16, 2025: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.