U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30341
  • Case Name: Lauren Michelle Samok
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Deficiency Notice - Amendment]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Amended Voluntary Petition]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.