U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30344
  • Case Name: Jose A. Colon
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Form 122 - Means Test]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.