U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30357
  • Case Name: Michael Anthony Bianchi
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Receipt of Installment Payment]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [List of Creditors]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.