U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20372
  • Case Name: Rebecca Ann Scavetta and Nicholas Paul Scavetta
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Novak, Anthony S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Schedules AB-J]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.