U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-20993
  • Case Name: Willi Matava
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Amended Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice re: Motions/Applications]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Complaint]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Avoid Lien]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - BK Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Chapter 13 Plan (Amended Before Confirmation)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.