U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-30370
  • Case Name: Federick Raymond Basso and Heather Basso
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [List of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: O'Connor, Andrea M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.