U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-50689
  • Case Name: Debbie E. Kerr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Continue Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Continue/Reschedule Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Certificate/Affidavit of Service]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Notice of Hearing - Appendix M/N or AP]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Compensation]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rescia, Kara S. [Compromise]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.