U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00616
  • Case Name: Rodriguez v. Noem et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • April 29, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 28, 2025: [Exhibit]
  • April 28, 2025: [Objection]
  • April 25, 2025: [Affidavit]
  • April 25, 2025: [Disclosure Statement]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 22, 2025: [Electronic Service Documents]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Standing Protective Order (Intake)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Pretrial Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Electronic Filing Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: [Electronic Summons Issued]
  • April 21, 2025: [Calendar Entry - Motion Hearing]
  • April 21, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.