U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-20391
  • Case Name: Ricardo Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Debtors Financial Management Course Completion Certificate]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Generate BNC Notice/Form]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Wage Execution Letter]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Form 122 - Means Test]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.