U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-50329
  • Case Name: Barton William Stuck
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Certified Copy of Docket Report]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Schedules AB-J]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Initial Statement About An Eviction Judgment Against You (Official Form 101A) - Incomplete]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Appear Remotely]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Virtual Order Served]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order to Show Cause]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [List of Creditors]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Order on Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Termination or Absence of Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Request for Electronic Service]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Filing Fee Paid in Full]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal - Individual]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Exigent Circumstances re: Credit Counseling]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Meeting of Creditors 13 - Bridgeport - auto]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Napolitano, Roberta [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.