U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Castillo-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Judgment]
  • July 17, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Oral Order]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • April 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • April 09, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 09, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • April 04, 2018: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • March 14, 2018: [Telephone Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 16, 2018: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Acknowledgment of Receipt]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2017: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • September 21, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • September 14, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.