U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Curtis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Judgment]
  • September 04, 2018: [--Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 29, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 24, 2018: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 16, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2018: [Continue]
  • August 14, 2018: [--Transcript (SEALED)]
  • August 14, 2018: [--Transcript]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order]
  • August 06, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2018
  • June 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 01, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • April 09, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 06, 2018: [Order]
  • April 04, 2018: [Forfeiture - Preliminary Order]
February, 2018
  • February 06, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 06, 2018: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
  • February 05, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • February 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 05, 2018: [Plea Hearing - Plea Accepted]
  • February 05, 2018: [Information - Felony]
  • February 05, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 02, 2018: [Sealed Document]
January, 2018
  • January 11, 2018: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • January 11, 2018: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2017: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2017: [Telephone Conference]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 06, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • October 06, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 06, 2017: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 03, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order]
  • September 27, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 22, 2017: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • September 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Hearing]
  • September 20, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • September 14, 2017: [Indictment]
  • September 14, 2017: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.