U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Guillen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Judgment]
November, 2017
  • November 20, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Downward Departure]
  • November 20, 2017: [Downward Departure]
  • November 20, 2017: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 20, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • November 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement Filed]
  • November 14, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2017: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2017: [Letter]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Scheduling Guilty Plea - Rule 11]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • September 18, 2017: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.