U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:11-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 06, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 06, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Order of Detention - Temporary Detention]
  • October 27, 2017: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 27, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2017: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 24, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 16, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 16, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • October 12, 2017: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • October 12, 2017: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.