U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Esham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 01, 2021: [--Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 17, 2021: [--Transcript]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 20, 2020: [Dismissal of Counts on Government Motion]
  • October 20, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • October 20, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • October 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 17, 2020: [In Forma Pauperis]
  • October 16, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • October 01, 2020: [Order]
  • October 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • September 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 15, 2020: [Letter]
July, 2020
  • July 22, 2020: [Order]
  • July 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2020: [Status Report ]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 30, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 30, 2020: [Letter]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2020: [Remark]
  • June 24, 2020: [Order]
  • June 24, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • June 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 08, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • June 01, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 31, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • May 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 21, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Order]
  • May 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 19, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2020: [Continue]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [--Transcript]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 03, 2020: [- CORRECTING ENTRY]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Letter]
  • February 06, 2020: [--Transcript]
January, 2020
  • January 13, 2020: [Status Report ]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order Scheduling Sentencing]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: [Redacted Document]
  • December 17, 2019: [Jury Verdict]
  • December 17, 2019: [Order Declaring a Mistrial]
  • December 16, 2019: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order for Jury Lunch]
  • December 16, 2019: [Jury Notes (Sealed)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • December 09, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • December 09, 2019: [Letter]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 04, 2019: [Jury Trial Held]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 22, 2019: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 20, 2019: [Jury Instructions ]
  • November 19, 2019: [Voir Dire Questions]
  • November 18, 2019: [Voir Dire - Proposed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Jury Instructions - Proposed]
  • November 18, 2019: [Exhibit to a Document]
  • November 18, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 07, 2019: [Status Conference - Deft. present]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order]
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order]
  • May 16, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 24, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order]
  • April 16, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2019: [Status Report ]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order]
  • February 19, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 18, 2019: [Status Report ]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 14, 2019: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2018
  • December 14, 2018: [Status Report ]
October, 2018
  • October 29, 2018: [Order]
  • October 29, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 25, 2018: [Status Report ]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Order]
  • September 20, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2018
  • August 27, 2018: [Order]
  • August 27, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2018: [Status Report ]
  • August 08, 2018: [Oral Order]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 01, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 19, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2018: [Status Conference - Deft. not present]
  • January 18, 2018: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • January 17, 2018: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • January 17, 2018: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 21, 2017: [Order]
  • December 21, 2017: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2017: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2017: [Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 02, 2017: [Protective Order]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Order to Continue - Pretrial Motion Filing]
  • October 26, 2017: [Arraignment - Not Guilty Plea]
  • October 26, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 26, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2017: [CJA 20 - Oral Appointment]
  • October 19, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 18, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Issue Summons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Summons]
  • October 13, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • October 13, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.