U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Delaware

delaware Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Delaware
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pratt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Exit Record]
  • October 23, 2019: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 29, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel]
  • May 13, 2019: [SO ORDERED - Probation Petition only]
  • May 13, 2019: [Probation Petition re Revocation of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 19, 2019: [Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order]
  • October 18, 2017: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • October 16, 2017: [Pleadings from Other District - Rule 5c3 - formerly rule 40]
  • October 16, 2017: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.